Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/27/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/28/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/02/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/24/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/28/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/10/2014