Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/05/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/26/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/26/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/04/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/05/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/02/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/25/2013