Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/26/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/02/2013