Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/14/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/21/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/19/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/19/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/19/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/19/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/19/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/19/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/19/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/15/2014