Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/05/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/01/2014