Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/20/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/21/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/21/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/26/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2013