Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/05/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/14/2014