Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/20/2013