Committees: H.R.885 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/28/2013 Referred to
04/24/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-70
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation03/04/2013 Referred to
04/16/2013 Hearings by
04/24/2013 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/04/2013 Referred to
11/13/2014 Markup by
12/10/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-302
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks07/31/2013 Hearings by