Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/25/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013