Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2013