Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/17/2014