Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/15/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2014