There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tax Return Due Date Simplification and Modernization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the logical flow of return information between partnerships, corporations, trusts, estates, and individuals to better enable each party to submit timely, accurate returns and reduce the need for extended and amended returns, to provide for modified due dates by regulation, and to conform the automatic corporate extension period to longstanding regulatory rule.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/28/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/15/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/15/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/22/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/28/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.901. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2013)

Tax Return Due Date Simplification and Modernization Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to change tax return due dates for partnerships (from April 15 to March 15, with a six-month extension), S corporations (from March 15 to March 31), and C corporations (from March 15 to April 15).

Requires the Secretary of the Treasury, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, to modify by regulation the due dates for extensions of tax returns for partnerships, trusts and estates, employee benefit plans, tax-exempt organizations, and certain trust funds. Sets a due date of April 15 for the annual information return of a foreign trust with a U.S. owner and for the report of foreign bank and financial accounts (with extensions until October 15).

Extends the automatic extension for corporation income tax returns from three to six months.