Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/15/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/15/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/22/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/22/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/15/2014