Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/04/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/05/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/07/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014