Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/11/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/17/2014