Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/17/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013