Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/04/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/04/2014