Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/11/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/20/2013