There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Health Service Corps Improvement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for the participation of optometrists in the National Health Service Corps scholarship and loan repayment programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/01/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (145)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/16/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/16/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/29/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/06/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/19/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/25/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/17/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/09/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/01/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.920. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2013)

National Health Service Corps Improvement Act of 2013 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to revise the definition of "primary health services" for purposes of the National Health Service Corps to include optometry health services.

Includes optometrists within: (1) the fellowship program for the delivery of primary health services in health professional shortage areas, (2) the National Health Service Corps Scholarship Program, and (3) the National Health Service Corps Loan Repayment Program.