Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/24/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/16/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/16/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/29/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/06/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/19/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/25/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/17/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/09/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2014