Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/08/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/25/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2014