Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/24/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/04/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/09/2014