Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/04/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/04/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/14/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/23/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/15/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/15/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/15/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/19/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/14/2014