Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.115 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To increase by $25,000,000 the amount appropriated for Operation and Maintenance for the Department of Defense for programs, projects, and activities in the continental United States, and to provide an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 115, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 59. Record Vote Number: 41. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  2. S.Amdt.93 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To transfer appropriations from the National Heritage Partnership Program to fund the resumption of public tours of the White House and visitor services and maintenance at national parks and monuments.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/14/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 93, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 40.
  3. S.Amdt.69 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To prohibit Urban Area Security Initiative grant recipients from funding projects that do not improve homeland security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 69, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 51. Record Vote Number: 39.
  4. S.Amdt.66 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To temporarily freeze the hiring of nonessential Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/14/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 66, under the order of 3/14/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 37. (consideration: CR S1829-1832; text: CR S1832)
  5. S.Amdt.33 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To strike certain authorities relating to the use for grants of funds of the Office of Economic Assistance of the Department of Defense.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 33 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  6. S.Amdt.30 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To prohibit the use of funds to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 30 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 52. Record Vote Number: 34.