Limit your search

1-4 of 4
  • S.Amdt.129 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To revise language regarding cluster munitions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 03/18/2013) (Proposed 03/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 129 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S1986)
  • S.Amdt.33 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strike certain authorities relating to the use for grants of funds of the Office of Economic Assistance of the Department of Defense.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 03/13/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/13/13 Amendment SA 33 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.29 to S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the expenditure of Federal funds to enforce the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule of the Environmental Protection Agency against farmers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 03/12/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
    Latest Action: 03/14/13 Amendment SA 29 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S1837)
  • S.Amdt.26   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 03/11/2013) (Proposed 03/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 03/20/13 Amendment SA 26 as modified, as amended, agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 29. Record Vote Number: 42.