Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/23/2013