Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/14/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/10/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/20/2013