Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2013