Refine your search

Refined by:

South Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/11/2013