Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2014