Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/13/2014