Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/08/2013