Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/2013