Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/22/2013