Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/18/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2013