Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/24/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/24/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/24/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 09/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/25/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/04/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/20/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/20/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/22/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/02/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/02/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/02/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/24/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/17/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/17/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/11/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/11/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/11/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/03/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/03/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/03/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/03/2014