Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2014