Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2014