Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/30/2014