Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013