Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/15/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/04/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/30/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/30/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/20/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/20/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/11/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/17/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/19/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/18/2014