Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/03/2013