Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/19/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2014