Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/06/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/31/2013