Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/15/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/19/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/09/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/09/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/30/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/19/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/2014