Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/10/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/10/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/02/2013