Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/04/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/12/2013