Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/09/2014